Home > Crown Bank > History
Crown Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Crown Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1998-04-13 | Institution established: Original name:Crown Bank, National Association | |
2002-10-23 | Reorganized. | |
2007-05-16 | Changed primary regulatory agency from COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY to FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION | |
2007-05-16 | Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL BANKS, STATE, NOT MEMBERS OF THE FRS | |
2007-05-16 | Changed name to Crown Bank | |
2009-07-31 | Acquired First BankAmericano (34270) in ELIZABETH, NJ as part of a government assisted transaction. | |
2013-06-10 | Moved bank headquarters from OCEAN CITY, NJ to ELIZABETH, NJ |