Home > Cowboy Bank > History
Cowboy Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Cowboy Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1900-05-01 | Institution established: Original name:The Bank of Kremlin | |
1994-03-21 | Acquired First State Bank of Goltry (8982) in GOLTRY, OK | |
1998-11-09 | Acquired Bank of Drummond (16274) in DRUMMOND, OK | |
1999-05-28 | Changed primary regulatory agency from FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION to FEDERAL RESERVE BOARD | |
2024-02-12 | Changed name to Cowboy Bank. |