Home > Commercial Bank and Trust of PA > History
Commercial Bank and Trust of PA, History
The following are major historical events for Commercial Bank and Trust of PA, including mergers and acquisitions.
1934-05-04 | Institution established: Original name:The Commercial National Bank of Latrobe | |
1963-02-20 | Changed name to Commercial National Bank of Westmoreland County | |
1990-07-01 | Reorganized. | |
1994-03-25 | Change trust powers from TRUST POWERS NOT GRANTED to FULL TRUST POWERS GRANTED | |
1999-10-01 | Changed name to Commercial National Bank of Pennsylvania | |
2003-07-21 | Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL BANKS, STATE, NOT MEMBERS OF THE FRS | |
2003-07-21 | Changed name to Commercial Bank of Pennsylvania | |
2003-07-21 | Changed primary regulatory agency from COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY to FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION | |
2004-12-31 | Acquired Highview Trust Company (57771) in GREENSBURG, PA | |
2004-12-31 | Changed name to Commercial Bank and Trust of PA |