Home > Coastal Heritage Bank > History
Coastal Heritage Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Coastal Heritage Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1889-01-01 | Institution established but was not FDIC insured. Original name: Weymouth Co-operative Bank | |
1986-03-11 | Became FDIC insured. | |
1993-08-30 | Moved bank headquarters from SOUTH WEYMOUTH, MA to EAST WEYMOUTH, MA | |
2002-10-01 | Changed name to Weymouth Bank | |
2006-06-28 | Changed organization type to COOPERATIVE BANK STOCK | |
2013-03-04 | Changed primary regulatory agency from STATE to FEDERAL RESERVE BOARD | |
2013-03-04 | Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL OR SAVINGS BANKS, STATE, MEMBERS FRS | |
2016-07-30 | Acquired Equitable Co-operative Bank (26453) in LYNN, MA | |
2016-07-30 | Changed name to Equitable Bank | |
2019-04-01 | Changed name to Coastal Heritage Bank | |
2019-04-01 | Moved bank headquarters from EAST WEYMOUTH, MA to WEYMOUTH, MA | |
2019-04-01 | Acquired Coastal Heritage Bank (26575) in WEYMOUTH, MA |