Home > Citizens Bank > History
Citizens Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Citizens Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
2005-05-13 | Institution established: Original name:Citizens Bank, N.A. | |
2007-09-01 | Acquired Citizens Bank of Massachusetts (18562) in BOSTON, MA | |
2007-09-01 | Acquired Citizens Bank of Rhode Island (16954) in PROVIDENCE, RI | |
2007-09-01 | Acquired Citizens Bank New Hampshire (6214) in MANCHESTER, NH | |
2007-09-01 | Acquired RBS National Bank (57858) in BRIDGEPORT, CT | |
2007-09-01 | Acquired Citizens Bank (57281) in WILMINGTON, DE | |
2007-09-01 | Acquired Charter One Bank, National Association (28932) in CLEVELAND, OH | |
2007-09-01 | Moved bank headquarters from ALBANY, NY to PROVIDENCE, RI | |
2007-09-01 | Changed name to RBS Citizens, National Association | |
2007-09-01 | Acquired Citizens Bank of Connecticut (18197) in NEW LONDON, CT | |
2012-07-06 | Reorganized. | |
2014-04-16 | Changed name to Citizens Bank, National Association | |
2019-01-02 | Acquired Citizens Bank of Pennsylvania (57282) in PHILADELPHIA, PA |