Home > Centennial Bank > History
Centennial Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Centennial Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1916-01-01 | Institution established: Original name:Farmer's and Merchants Bank | |
1986-07-16 | Changed name to Farmer's & Merchants Bank | |
2007-08-24 | Acquired Citizens City & County Bank (34399) in TRENTON, TN | |
2016-01-04 | Changed name to Centennial Bank | |
2016-01-04 | Acquired Medina Banking Co. (10316) in MEDINA, TN | |
2018-04-01 | Acquired Merchants & Planters Bank (8665) in BOLIVAR, TN | |
2019-07-01 | Acquired Chester County Bank (19813) in HENDERSON, TN | |
2019-07-01 | Acquired Farmers & Merchants Bank (9188) in ADAMSVILLE, TN |