Home > CCB Community Bank > History
CCB Community Bank, History
The following are major historical events for CCB Community Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1947-07-01 | Institution established: Original name:Covington County Bank | |
1977-04-01 | Changed name to Citibanc of Alabama, Andalusia, Alabama | |
1984-06-01 | Changed name to SouthTrust Bank of Covington County | |
1985-03-20 | Changed name to Covington County Bank | |
1999-04-01 | Changed primary regulatory agency from FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION to FEDERAL RESERVE BOARD | |
2007-07-02 | Changed name to CCB COMMUNITY BANK | |
2014-01-01 | Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL BANKS, STATE, NOT MEMBERS OF THE FRS | |
2014-01-01 | Changed primary regulatory agency from FEDERAL RESERVE BOARD to FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION |