Home > Catalyst Bank > History
Catalyst Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Catalyst Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1922-01-01 | Institution established: Original name:St Landry Homestead Association | |
1989-09-30 | Changed organization type to MUTUAL SAVINGS BANK | |
1989-09-30 | Changed name to St Landry Homestead Federal Savings Bank | |
2011-07-21 | Changed primary regulatory agency from OFFICE OF THRIFT SUPERVISION to COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY | |
2021-06-10 | Moved bank headquarters from 235 N Court St, Opelousas, LA to 235 N Court St, Opelousas, LA. | |
2021-10-12 | Changed Organization Type to STOCK SAVINGS BANK. | |
2022-06-23 | Changed name to Catalyst Bank. |