Home > Capital City Bank > History
Capital City Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Capital City Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1907-06-13 | Institution established: Original name:Havana State Bank | |
1995-01-01 | Changed primary regulatory agency from FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION to FEDERAL RESERVE BOARD | |
1995-01-01 | Changed name to Capital City Bank | |
1995-01-01 | Acquired Gadsden National Bank (26981) in QUINCY, FL | |
1995-01-01 | Moved bank headquarters from HAVANA, FL to TALLAHASSEE, FL | |
1995-01-01 | Acquired First National Bank of Jefferson County (22773) in MONTICELLO, FL | |
1995-01-01 | Acquired Industrial National Bank (16427) in TALLAHASSEE, FL | |
1995-01-01 | Acquired Capital City Second National Bank (19692) in TALLAHASSEE, FL | |
1995-01-01 | Acquired City National Bank (21839) in TALLAHASSEE, FL | |
1995-01-01 | Acquired Capital City First National Bank of Tallahassee (5665) in TALLAHASSEE, FL | |
1996-12-07 | Acquired First Federal Bank (31194) in TALLAHASSEE, FL | |
1997-10-18 | Acquired Branford State Bank (5671) in BRANFORD, FL | |
1997-10-18 | Acquired Farmers & Merchants Bank of Trenton (12077) in TRENTON, FL | |
1997-10-18 | Acquired Levy County State Bank (16734) in CHIEFLAND, FL | |
2001-03-03 | Acquired First National Bank of West Point (192) in WEST POINT, GA | |
2001-11-03 | Acquired First National Bank of Grady County (19457) in CAIRO, GA | |
2004-03-20 | Acquired The Quincy State Bank (21295) in QUINCY, FL | |
2004-10-16 | Acquired Farmers & Merchants Bank (10059) in DUBLIN, GA | |
2005-05-21 | Acquired The First National Bank of Alachua (3550) in ALACHUA, FL |