Home > Broadway National Bank > History
Broadway National Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Broadway National Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1941-02-03 | Institution established: Original name:Broadway National Bank of Alamo Heights | |
1966-02-15 | Changed name to Broadway National Bank | |
1984-04-04 | Change trust powers from TRUST POWERS NOT GRANTED to FULL TRUST POWERS GRANTED | |
1987-01-31 | Acquired Broadway National Bank/Westplex (26230) in SAN ANTONIO, TX | |
1987-03-30 | Acquired Heights National Bank (26434) in SAN ANTONIO, TX | |
2004-08-12 | Acquired Eisenhower National Bank (21117) in SAN ANTONIO, TX | |
2005-11-05 | Acquired Balcones Bank, S.S.B. (32004) in SAN MARCOS, TX |