Home > Better Banks > History
Better Banks, History
The following are major historical events for Better Banks, including mergers and acquisitions.
1898-01-01 | Institution established: Original name:Dunlap State Bank | |
2000-01-27 | Changed name to Dunlap Bank | |
2002-12-31 | Reorganized. | |
2004-09-17 | Changed name to Better Banks | |
2004-09-17 | Acquired Bartonville Bank (10475) in BARTONVILLE, IL | |
2004-09-17 | Moved bank headquarters from DUNLAP, IL to PEORIA, IL | |
2006-10-13 | Acquired Wyoming Bank & Trust Co. (15096) in WYOMING, IL | |
2011-06-18 | Acquired Farmers State Bank, Astoria (23324) in ASTORIA, IL | |
2014-08-15 | Acquired First National Bank of Chillicothe (3635) in CHILLICOTHE, IL | |
2022-06-17 | Acquired Glasford State BankBetter Banks (8492) in GLASFORD, IL. |