Home > BayVanguard Bank > History
BayVanguard Bank, History
The following are major historical events for BayVanguard Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1873-09-01 | Institution established: Original name:Light Street Savings and Building Association | |
1988-03-31 | Changed name to Light Street Federal Savings and Loan Association | |
1990-06-01 | Acquired Weekly Savings and Loan Association (32361) in BALTIMORE, MD | |
1990-06-01 | Changed name to Bay Federal Savings and Loan Association | |
1996-04-01 | Acquired Vanguard Savings and Loan Association (32384) in BALTIMORE, MD | |
1996-04-01 | Changed name to Bay-Vanguard Federal Savings Bank | |
1996-04-01 | Changed organization type to MUTUAL SAVINGS BANK | |
2011-07-21 | Changed primary regulatory agency from OFFICE OF THRIFT SUPERVISION to COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY | |
2013-05-31 | Acquired Vigilant Federal Savings Bank (32547) in BALTIMORE, MD | |
2018-08-23 | Changed primary regulatory agency from COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY to FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION | |
2018-08-23 | Changed institution class to FDIC SUPERVISED SAVINGS BANK | |
2018-08-23 | Changed name to BayVanguard Bank | |
2019-02-28 | Acquired Kopernik Bank (29901) in BALTIMORE, MD | |
2020-02-29 | Acquired Madison Bank of Maryland (32331) in FOREST HILL, MD | |
2020-10-31 | Acquired 1880 Bank (4829) in CAMBRIDGE, MD |