Bank Plus, History
The following are major historical events for Bank Plus, including mergers and acquisitions.
1947-03-01 | Institution established: Original name:Swea City State Bank | |
1986-05-29 | Acquired The Lone Rock Bank, National Association (25297) in LONE ROCK, IA | |
1986-08-07 | Acquired Graettinger State Bank (18377) in GRAETTINGER, IA | |
1997-01-01 | Changed name to Bank Plus | |
1997-01-15 | Moved bank headquarters from SWEA CITY, IA to ESTHERVILLE, IA | |
2012-11-30 | Acquired State Bank of Ledyard (14411) in LEDYARD, IA |