Home > Bank of Easton > History
Bank of Easton, History
The following are major historical events for Bank of Easton, including mergers and acquisitions.
1889-01-01 | Institution established but was not FDIC insured. Original name: Easton Co-operative Bank | |
1986-02-04 | Became FDIC insured. | |
2002-06-30 | Changed name to Bank of Easton, A Co-operative Bank | |
2004-09-28 | Changed primary regulatory agency from STATE to FEDERAL RESERVE BOARD | |
2004-09-28 | Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL OR SAVINGS BANKS, STATE, MEMBERS FRS | |
2004-09-28 | Changed organization type to COOPERATIVE BANK | |
2006-03-31 | Changed name to Bank of Easton |