Home > Bank of Ann Arbor > History
Bank of Ann Arbor, History
The following are major historical events for Bank of Ann Arbor, including mergers and acquisitions.
1996-01-16 | Institution established: Original name:Bank of Ann Arbor | |
1996-07-16 | Reorganized. | |
1997-04-04 | Change trust powers from TRUST POWERS NOT GRANTED to FULL TRUST POWERS GRANTED | |
2010-05-14 | Acquired New Liberty Bank (35586) in PLYMOUTH, MI as part of a government assisted transaction. | |
2017-01-06 | Acquired Bank of Birmingham (58101) in BIRMINGHAM, MI | |
2021-11-30 | Moved bank headquarters from 125 SOUTH FIFTH AVENUE, ANN ARBOR, MI to 125 S 5th Ave, ANN ARBOR, MI. | |
2021-11-30 | Acquired First National Bank in HowellBank of Ann Arbor (14370) in HOWELL, MI. | |
2022-01-22 |