Home > Bank of America California > History
Bank of America California, History
The following are major historical events for Bank of America California, including mergers and acquisitions.
1984-05-18 | Acquired Bank of Irvine (21410) in IRVINE, CA | |
1984-05-18 | Institution established: Original name:Security Pacific State Bank | |
1993-01-29 | Moved bank headquarters from IRVINE, CA to COSTA MESA, CA | |
1993-09-01 | Changed name to Bank of America Community Development Bank | |
1993-09-01 | Moved bank headquarters from COSTA MESA, CA to WALNUT CREEK, CA | |
1993-09-01 | Acquired Bank of America Community Development Bank (32906) in WALNUT CREEK, CA | |
2000-05-17 | Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL BANK, NATIONAL, MEMBER FRS | |
2000-05-17 | Changed primary regulatory agency from FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION to COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY | |
2000-05-17 | Changed name to Bank of America Community Development Bank, National Association | |
2000-09-01 | Changed name to Bank of America California, National Association | |
2002-02-01 | Moved bank headquarters from WALNUT CREEK, CA to SAN FRANCISCO, CA | |
2009-01-16 | Maintained operations with government open bank assistance. |