BANK, History
The following are major historical events for BANK, including mergers and acquisitions.
1931-02-13 | Institution established: Original name:Iowa State Bank | |
1984-07-01 | Changed name to Iowa National Bank | |
1987-10-01 | Moved bank headquarters from MORNING SUN, IA to WAPELLO, IA | |
1987-12-30 | Change trust powers from FULL TRUST POWERS GRANTED to TRUST POWERS TERMINATED | |
1992-06-30 | Changed name to Iowa State Bank | |
2015-01-12 | Changed name to Bank |