Home > Apple Bank > History
Apple Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Apple Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1863-04-17 | Institution established: Original name:Harlem Savings Bank | |
1981-12-04 | Acquired Central Savings Bank (16064) in NEW YORK CITY, NY | |
1983-05-16 | Changed name to Apple Bank for Savings | |
1985-07-03 | Changed organization type to STOCK SAVINGS BANK | |
1987-01-01 | Acquired Eastern Savings Bank (15958) in NEW YORK CITY, NY | |
1988-10-12 | Moved bank headquarters from NEW YORK CITY, NY to GARDEN CITY, NY | |
1989-09-29 | Reorganized. | |
1989-12-01 | Acquired Sag Harbor Savings Bank (15984) in SAG HARBOR, NY | |
1996-09-23 | Moved bank headquarters from GARDEN CITY, NY to NORTH HEMPSTEAD, NY | |
1998-07-24 | Moved bank headquarters from NORTH HEMPSTEAD, NY to SCARSDALE, NY | |
2005-01-24 | Moved bank headquarters from SCARSDALE, NY to MANHASSET, NY | |
2020-06-16 | Moved bank headquarters from MANHASSET, NY to New York, NY |