Home > Amistad Bank > History
Amistad Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Amistad Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1986-04-25 | Institution established: Original name:First National Bank - Big Lake | |
1993-02-24 | Changed name to First National Bank of Big Lake | |
1994-03-15 | Changed name to Big Lake Bank, National Association | |
1997-07-01 | Reorganized. | |
2003-06-20 | Changed primary regulatory agency from COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY to FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION | |
2003-06-20 | Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL BANKS, STATE, NOT MEMBERS OF THE FRS | |
2003-06-20 | Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL BANKS, STATE, NOT MEMBERS OF THE FRS | |
2003-06-20 | Changed name to Big Lake Bank | |
2003-09-26 | Changed name to Amistad Bank | |
2003-09-26 | Moved bank headquarters from BIG LAKE, TX to DEL RIO, TX |