Home > 42 North Private Bank > History
42 North Private Bank, History
The following are major historical events for 42 North Private Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1967-01-01 | Institution established but was not FDIC insured. Original name: Domestic Safe Deposit Company | |
1987-07-20 | Became FDIC insured. | |
1990-04-01 | Changed name to Domestic Loan and Investment Bank | |
1997-02-28 | Changed primary regulatory agency from STATE to OFFICE OF THRIFT SUPERVISION | |
1997-02-28 | Changed organization type to STOCK SAVINGS BANK | |
1997-02-28 | Changed name to Domestic Bank | |
2010-11-15 | Changed name to Admirals Bank | |
2011-07-21 | Changed primary regulatory agency from OFFICE OF THRIFT SUPERVISION to COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY | |
2013-06-28 | Moved bank headquarters from CRANSTON, RI to BOSTON, MA | |
2019-10-01 | Changed name to ETHIC | |
2021-08-07 | Changed name to Ethic, A Wealth Bank. |