Home > 21st Century Bank > History
21st Century Bank, History
The following are major historical events for 21st Century Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1917-06-02 | Institution established: Original name:Crosstown State Bank of Cedar, Inc. | |
1980-01-28 | Changed name to Crosstown State Bank of Ham Lake, Inc. | |
1980-01-28 | Moved bank headquarters from CEDAR, MN to HAM LAKE, MN | |
1998-01-01 | Changed name to 21st Century Bank - North | |
2002-11-09 | Changed name to 21st Century Bank | |
2002-11-09 | Acquired 21st Century Bank (8841) in ROGERS, MN | |
2004-09-03 | Acquired State Bank of Loretto (8215) in LORETTO, MN | |
2004-09-03 | Moved bank headquarters from HAM LAKE, MN to LORETTO, MN |