Home > 1st Bank of Sea Isle City > History
1st Bank of Sea Isle City, History
The following are major historical events for 1st Bank of Sea Isle City, including mergers and acquisitions.
1882-01-01 | Institution established: Original name:First Savings and Loan Association of Sea Isle City New Jersey | |
1998-10-05 | Changed name to First Bank of Sea Isle City | |
1998-10-05 | Changed organization type to MUTUAL SAVINGS BANK | |
2000-06-01 | Changed organization type to STOCK SAVINGS BANK | |
2000-09-27 | Changed name to 1st Bank of Sea Isle City | |
2011-07-21 | Changed primary regulatory agency from OFFICE OF THRIFT SUPERVISION to COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY | |
2013-12-12 | Changed institution class to FDIC SUPERVISED SAVINGS BANK | |
2013-12-12 | Changed primary regulatory agency from COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY to FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION |