Wake Forest Federal Savings and Loan Association
Status: | Inactive as of 01/02/2024 |
Merger - Without Assistance | |
Successor Bank: | Piedmont Federal Savings Bank |
Headquarters: | Wake Forest Federal Savings and Loan Association 302 Brooks St Wake Forest, NC 27587 |
Established: | 01/01/1922 |
FDIC Insurance: | 08/09/1989 |
FDIC Cert: | #27704 |
Charter Class: | Savings banks, state charter, supervised by the FDIC |
Total Assets: | $122,285,000 |
Total Deposits: | $93,987,000 |
History
1922-01-01 | Institution established: Original name:Wake Forest Federal Savings and Loan Association | |
1988-03-31 | Changed organization type to STOCK SAVINGS & LOAN | |
2011-07-21 | Changed primary regulatory agency from OFFICE OF THRIFT SUPERVISION to COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY | |
2024-01-02 | Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Piedmont Federal Savings Bank (27619) |