Virginia Commonwealth Bank
Status: | Inactive as of 04/01/2017 |
Merger - Without Assistance | |
Successor Bank: | Virginia Commonwealth Bank |
Headquarters: | Virginia Commonwealth Bank 1965 Wakefield Ave Petersburg, VA 23805 |
Established: | 08/22/1936 |
FDIC Insurance: | 08/22/1936 |
FDIC Cert: | #29742 |
Charter Class: | Commercial bank, state charter and Fed member, supervised by the Federal Reserve (FRB) |
Total Assets: | $326,459,000 |
Total Deposits: | $266,103,000 |
History
1936-08-22 | Institution established: Original name:First Federal Savings Bank of Virginia | |
1983-01-31 | Acquired Security Savings and Loan Association (32010) in HAYES, VA | |
2008-10-01 | Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL OR SAVINGS BANKS, STATE, MEMBERS FRS | |
2008-10-01 | Changed organization type to COMMERCIAL BANK | |
2008-10-01 | Changed primary regulatory agency from OFFICE OF THRIFT SUPERVISION to FEDERAL RESERVE BOARD | |
2008-10-01 | Changed name to Virginia Commonwealth Bank | |
2017-04-01 | Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Virginia Commonwealth Bank (11200) in RICHMOND, VA | |
2021-01-31 | Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Blue Ridge Bank, National Association (35274) |