Union Bank & Trust
Status: | Inactive as of 02/17/1976 |
Merger - Without Assistance | |
Successor Bank: | First PREMIER Bank |
Headquarters: | Union Bank & Trust Tenth And Main Streets , 57102 |
Established: | 05/01/1929 |
FDIC Insurance: | 01/01/1934 |
FDIC Cert: | #6068 |
Charter Class: | Commercial bank, state charter and Fed member, supervised by the Federal Reserve (FRB) |
History
1929-05-01 | Institution established: Original name:Union Bank & Trust | |
1976-02-17 | Merged into and subsequently operated as part of United National Bank (6085) in SIOUX FALLS, SD | |
1978-11-04 | Acquired Rosholt Community Bank (6082) in ROSHOLT, SD | |
1985-10-11 | Acquired SunBank of South Dakota (22005) in SIOUX FALLS, SD | |
1985-10-17 | Acquired United National Bank (9001) in WATERTOWN, SD | |
1985-12-02 | Acquired Farmers State Bank, of Kranzburg, S. D. (12647) in KRANZBURG, SD | |
1988-05-27 | Changed name to First Interstate Bank of South Dakota, National Association (6085) | |
1992-10-01 | Changed name to First Premier Bank, National Association (6085) | |
1996-06-24 | Changed name to First PREMIER Bank (6085) |