Home > Touchstone Bank > History
Touchstone Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Touchstone Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1906-01-01 | Institution established: Original name:The Bank of McKenney, Incorporated | |
1989-05-05 | Changed name to Bank of McKenney | |
2003-05-28 | Moved bank headquarters from MCKENNEY, VA to MC KENNEY, VA | |
2017-11-11 | Acquired Citizens Community Bank (35326) in SOUTH HILL, VA | |
2017-11-11 | Changed name to Touchstone Bank | |
2018-03-19 | Moved bank headquarters from MC KENNEY, VA to PRINCE GEORGE, VA |