Home > TIAA, FSB > History

TIAA, FSB, History

The following are major historical events for TIAA, FSB, including mergers and acquisitions.

1998-10-01Institution established: Original name:First Alliance Bank
2001-01-02Acquired Marine National Bank of Jacksonville (19822) in JACKSONVILLE, FL
2004-02-02Changed name to EverBank
2010-05-28Acquired Bank of Florida - Tampa Bay (57814) in TAMPA, FL as part of a government assisted transaction.
2010-05-28Acquired Bank of Florida - Southwest (35106) in NAPLES, FL as part of a government assisted transaction.
2010-05-28Acquired Bank of Florida - Southeast (57360) in FORT LAUDERDALE, FL as part of a government assisted transaction.
2011-07-21Changed primary regulatory agency from OFFICE OF THRIFT SUPERVISION to COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY
2017-06-09Changed name to TIAA, FSB
2017-06-09Acquired TIAA-CREF Trust Company, FSB (34723) in SAINT LOUIS, MO
2021-09-01Moved bank headquarters from 301 W Bay St, Jacksonville, FL to 301 W Bay St, Jacksonville, FL.