The First State Bank
Status: | Inactive as of 07/01/2022 |
Merger - Without Assistance | |
Successor Bank: | Harmony Bank |
Headquarters: | The First State Bank 100 North Mckinney Street Rice, TX 75155 |
Established: | 02/27/1928 |
FDIC Insurance: | 01/01/1934 |
FDIC Cert: | #9973 |
Charter Class: | Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember, supervised by the FDIC |
Total Assets: | $221,586,000 |
Total Deposits: | $198,858,000 |
History
1928-02-27 | Institution established: Original name:The First State Bank | |
2022-07-01 | Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Harmony Bank, National Association (3281) |