The Farmers National Bank of Emlenton, History

The following are a list of major historical events for The Farmers National Bank of Emlenton, including mergers and acquisitions.

1900-01-01Institution established: Original name:The Farmers National Bank of Emlenton
1990-04-01Reorganized.
1998-08-31Acquired Peoples Savings Bank (30609) in RIDGWAY, PA
2008-10-17Acquired Elk County Savings and Loan Association (31353) in RIDGWAY, PA
2016-04-30Acquired United-American Savings Bank (27033) in PITTSBURGH, PA
2017-09-30Acquired Northern Hancock Bank & Trust Co. (22647) in NEWELL, WV
2018-10-01Acquired Community First Bank (7953) in REYNOLDSVILLE, PA