The Cortland Savings and Banking Company

Status:Inactive as of 2021-11-01
 Merger - Without Assistance
Successor Bank:The Farmers National Bank of Canfield
Headquarters:The Cortland Savings and Banking Company
194 West Main Street
Cortland, OH 44410
Established:1892-01-01
FDIC Insurance:1934-01-01
FDIC Cert:#2281
Charter Class:Commercial bank, state charter and Fed member, supervised by the Federal Reserve (FRB)
# of Branches:13
Total Assets:$795,629,000
Total Deposits:$693,183,000

History

1892-01-01Institution established: Original name:The Cortland Savings and Banking Company
1979-10-15Acquired Western Reserve Bank of Portage County (17779) in WINDHAM, OH

Financial Information (2021-09-30 and Older)