Standing Stone Bank
Status: | Inactive as of 11/12/2021 |
Merger - Without Assistance | |
Successor Bank: | The Savings Bank |
Headquarters: | Standing Stone Bank 137 West Wheeling Street Lancaster, OH 43130 |
Established: | 05/12/1989 |
FDIC Insurance: | 05/12/1989 |
FDIC Cert: | #27506 |
Charter Class: | Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember, supervised by the FDIC |
Total Assets: | $111,254,000 |
Total Deposits: | $99,531,000 |
History
1989-05-12 | Institution established: Original name:Standing Stone National Bank | |
2005-05-31 | Reorganized. | |
2014-12-31 | Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL BANKS, STATE, NOT MEMBERS OF THE FRS | |
2014-12-31 | Changed primary regulatory agency from COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY to FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION | |
2014-12-31 | Changed name to Standing Stone Bank |