St Landry Homestead Federal Savings Bank, History

The following are major historical events for St Landry Homestead Federal Savings Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.

1922-01-01Institution established: Original name:St Landry Homestead Association
1989-09-30Changed organization type to MUTUAL SAVINGS BANK
1989-09-30Changed name to St Landry Homestead Federal Savings Bank
2011-07-21Changed primary regulatory agency from OFFICE OF THRIFT SUPERVISION to COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY
2021-06-10Moved bank headquarters from 235 N Court St, Opelousas, LA to 235 N Court St, Opelousas, LA.
2021-10-12Changed Organization Type to STOCK SAVINGS BANK.