Peoples Trust and Savings Bank
Status: | Inactive as of 12/08/2023 |
Merger - Without Assistance | |
Successor Bank: | Farmers and Merchants Savings Bank |
Headquarters: | Peoples Trust and Savings Bank 90 Railroad St Riverside, IA 52327 |
Established: | 03/20/1928 |
FDIC Insurance: | 01/01/1934 |
FDIC Cert: | #11351 |
Charter Class: | Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember, supervised by the FDIC |
Total Assets: | $32,422,000 |
Total Deposits: | $26,061,000 |
History
1928-03-20 | Institution established: Original name:Peoples Trust and Savings Bank | |
1992-01-07 | Reorganized. | |
2023-12-08 | Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Farmers and Merchants Savings Bank (10492) |