Pacific Western Bank, History

The following are major historical events for Pacific Western Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.

1982-08-26Institution established: Original name:First Professional Bank, National Association
2001-10-08Acquired First Charter Bank, National Association (24451) in BEVERLY HILLS, CA
2002-01-23Changed name to Pacific Western National Bank
2002-01-23Acquired First Community Bank of the Desert (23232) in INDIAN WELLS, CA
2002-01-23Acquired Pacific Western National Bank (23263) in PICO RIVERA, CA
2002-08-22Acquired Upland Bank (25060) in UPLAND, CA
2002-08-23Acquired Marathon National Bank (24675) in LOS ANGELES, CA
2003-08-22Acquired Verdugo Banking Company (33483) in GLENDALE, CA
2004-04-16Acquired Harbor National Bank (24210) in NEWPORT BEACH, CA
2005-08-12Acquired First American Bank (24308) in ROSEMEAD, CA
2005-10-07Acquired Pacific Liberty Bank (34817) in HUNTINGTON BEACH, CA
2006-01-04Acquired Cedars Bank (27069) in LOS ANGELES, CA
2006-05-10Acquired Foothill Independent Bank (21104) in GLENDORA, CA
2006-09-13Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL BANKS, STATE, NOT MEMBERS OF THE FRS
2006-09-13Changed primary regulatory agency from COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY to FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION
2006-09-13Changed name to Pacific Western Bank
2006-10-26Acquired Community National Bank (26426) in ESCONDIDO, CA
2006-10-26Moved bank headquarters from SANTA MONICA, CA to SAN DIEGO, CA
2006-10-26Acquired First National Bank (23743) in RANCHO SANTA FE, CA
2008-11-07Acquired Security Pacific Bank (23595) in LOS ANGELES, CA as part of a government assisted transaction.
2009-08-28Acquired Affinity Bank (27197) in VENTURA, CA as part of a government assisted transaction.
2010-08-20Acquired Los Padres Bank (32165) in SOLVANG, CA as part of a government assisted transaction.
2010-12-20Moved bank headquarters from SAN DIEGO, CA to LOS ANGELES, CA
2012-08-01Acquired American Perspective Bank (58614) in SAN LUIS OBISPO, CA
2013-06-01Acquired First California Bank (22819) in WESTLAKE VILLAGE, CA
2014-04-07Acquired CapitalSource Bank (58878) in LOS ANGELES, CA
2015-10-07Acquired Square 1 Bank (58021) in DURHAM, NC
2016-01-09Moved bank headquarters from LOS ANGELES, CA to BEVERLY HILLS, CA
2017-10-20Acquired California United Bank (57904) in LOS ANGELES, CA
2019-06-28Reorganized.