Ormsby State Bank
Status: | Inactive as of 01/22/2021 |
Absorption - Without Assistance | |
Successor Bank: | Citizens Bank Minnesota |
Headquarters: | Ormsby State Bank 513 Main St Ormsby, MN 56162 |
Established: | 07/01/1901 |
FDIC Insurance: | 01/01/1934 |
FDIC Cert: | #1388 |
Charter Class: | Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember, supervised by the FDIC |
Total Assets: | $27,172,000 |
Total Deposits: | $22,860,000 |
History
1901-07-01 | Institution established: Original name:Farmers State Bank of Ormsby | |
1961-07-01 | Changed name to Ormsby State Bank | |
2021-01-22 | Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Citizens Bank Minnesota (8200) |