New Mexico Bank & Trust
Status: | Inactive as of 08/18/2023 |
Merger - Without Assistance | |
Successor Bank: | HTLF Bank |
Headquarters: | New Mexico Bank & Trust 320 Gold Ave Sw Albuquerque, NM 87102 |
Established: | 05/04/1998 |
FDIC Insurance: | 05/04/1998 |
FDIC Cert: | #34726 |
Charter Class: | Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember, supervised by the FDIC |
Total Assets: | $2,592,766,000 |
Total Deposits: | $2,366,443,000 |
History
1998-05-04 | Institution established: Original name:New Mexico Bank & Trust | |
2000-01-01 | Acquired First National Bank of Clovis (2250) in CLOVIS, NM | |
2015-08-21 | Acquired Community Bank (21000) in SANTA FE, NM | |
2021-03-24 |