Home > MUFG Union Bank > History

MUFG Union Bank, History

The following are a list of major historical events for MUFG Union Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.

1979-03-09Institution established: Original name:Bank of Palm Springs
1987-10-01Changed name to The Bank of California, National Association
1987-10-01Moved bank headquarters from PALM SPRINGS, CA to SAN FRANCISCO, CA
1987-10-01Acquired The Bank of California, National Association (3509) in SAN FRANCISCO, CA
1987-10-01Change trust powers from TRUST POWERS NOT GRANTED to FULL TRUST POWERS GRANTED
1988-07-29Acquired The Mitsubishi Bank of California (20598) in LOS ANGELES, CA
1996-04-01Changed name to Union Bank of California, National Association
1996-04-01Acquired Union Bank (17186) in SAN FRANCISCO, CA
2002-05-13Acquired First Western Bank (23357) in SIMI VALLEY, CA
2002-10-31Acquired Valencia Bank & Trust (27091) in SANTA CLARITA, CA
2002-12-31Acquired COPPER MOUNTAIN TRUST CORPORATION (91103) in PORTLAND, OR
2003-07-01Reorganized.
2003-07-01Acquired Monterey Bay Bank (28271) in WATSONVILLE, CA
2004-01-16Acquired Business Bank of California (25070) in SAN BERNARDINO, CA
2004-10-28Acquired Jackson Federal Bank (28653) in FULLERTON, CA
2008-12-18Changed name to Union Bank, National Association
2009-09-24Acquired Texas First Bank - Winnie (18046) in DALLAS, TX
2010-04-16Acquired Tamalpais Bank (33493) in SAN RAFAEL, CA as part of a government assisted transaction.
2010-04-30Acquired Frontier Bank (22710) in EVERETT, WA as part of a government assisted transaction.
2012-12-03Acquired Santa Barbara Bank & Trust, National Association (18169) in SANTA BARBARA, CA
2014-07-01Changed name to MUFG Union Bank, National Association