Mitchell Bank
Status: | Inactive as of 12/31/2020 |
Absorption - Without Assistance | |
Successor Bank: | First Federal Bank of Wisconsin |
Headquarters: | Mitchell Bank 1039 West Mitchell Street Milwaukee, WI 53204 |
Established: | 01/01/1907 |
FDIC Insurance: | 01/01/1934 |
FDIC Cert: | #13029 |
Charter Class: | Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember, supervised by the FDIC |
Total Assets: | $57,405,000 |
Total Deposits: | $48,754,000 |
History
1907-01-01 | Institution established: Original name:Mitchell Street State Bank of Milwaukee | |
1988-03-24 | Changed name to Mitchell Bank | |
2020-12-31 | Merged into and subsequently operated as part of First Federal Bank of Wisconsin (30422) |