Home > Merchants and Manufacturers Bank > History
Merchants and Manufacturers Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Merchants and Manufacturers Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1969-09-24 | Institution established: Original name:East Joliet Bank | |
1987-03-20 | Changed name to Westbank/Will County | |
1987-09-10 | Change trust powers from TRUST POWERS NOT GRANTED to LIMITED TRUST POWERS GRANTED | |
1988-09-24 | Acquired First Bank of Channahon (22556) in CHANNAHON, IL | |
1993-05-01 | Changed name to Bank of Joliet | |
1997-02-19 | Change trust powers from LIMITED TRUST POWERS GRANTED to TRUST POWERS TERMINATED | |
2000-09-01 | Changed name to Merchants and Manufacturers Bank |