Home > Marine Bank > History

Marine Bank, History

The following are major historical events for Marine Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.

1970-09-04Institution established: Original name:Peoples National Bank of Springfield
1987-05-06Reorganized.
1988-03-01Changed name to Peoples Bank of Springfield
1993-11-01Changed name to Marine Bank, Springfield
1994-10-28Change trust powers from TRUST POWERS NOT GRANTED to LIMITED TRUST POWERS GRANTED
1996-06-11Change trust powers from LIMITED TRUST POWERS GRANTED to FULL TRUST POWERS GRANTED
2010-01-28Changed name to Marine Bank
2013-10-04Acquired Schuyler State Bank (19710) in RUSHVILLE, IL