Iowa Prairie Bank, History

The following are a list of major historical events for Iowa Prairie Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.

1929-01-01Institution established: Original name:First State Bank
1998-01-28Changed primary regulatory agency from FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION to FEDERAL RESERVE BOARD
1999-03-20Acquired Farmers State Bank (16930) in MERRILL, IA
1999-04-23Changed name to Prairie State Bank
2003-01-01Changed name to Iowa Prairie Bank