Home > Howard Bank > History

Howard Bank, History

The following are a list of major historical events for Howard Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.

2004-08-09Institution established: Original name:Howard Bank
2014-10-17Acquired NBRS Financial (4862) in RISING SUN, MD as part of a government assisted transaction.
2015-08-29Acquired The Patapsco Bank (30869) in BALTIMORE, MD
2018-03-01Acquired First Mariner Bank (31286) in BALTIMORE, MD
2018-04-06Moved bank headquarters from ELLICOTT CITY, MD to BALTIMORE, MD