Home > Hometown Bank > History
Hometown Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Hometown Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1889-01-01 | Institution established but was not FDIC insured. Original name: Webster Co-operative Bank | |
1986-02-03 | Became FDIC insured. | |
1998-01-28 | Changed name to Hometown Bank, A Cooperative Bank | |
2004-06-30 | Change trust powers from TRUST POWERS NOT GRANTED to LIMITED TRUST POWERS GRANTED | |
2011-04-01 | Acquired Athol-Clinton Co-operative Bank (27293) in ATHOL, MA | |
2014-03-07 | Changed name to Hometown Bank | |
2014-03-07 | Moved bank headquarters from WEBSTER, MA to OXFORD, MA | |
2016-08-17 | Changed organization type to COOPERATIVE BANK | |
2016-08-17 | Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL OR SAVINGS BANKS, STATE, MEMBERS FRS | |
2016-08-17 | Changed primary regulatory agency from STATE to FEDERAL RESERVE BOARD | |
2019-10-19 | Acquired Millbury Savings Bank (21920) in MILLBURY, MA |