Flagstar Bank, FSB, History

The following are major historical events for Flagstar Bank, FSB, including mergers and acquisitions.

1987-05-20Institution established: Original name:First Security Savings Bank FSB
1988-06-30Changed name to First Security Savings Bank, FSB
1991-05-31Change trust powers from TRUST POWERS NOT GRANTED to FULL TRUST POWERS GRANTED
1996-01-01Changed name to Flagstar Bank, FSB
1996-02-01Acquired Security Savings Bank, FSB (30008) in JACKSON, MI
2000-10-10Moved bank headquarters from BLOOMFIELD HILLS, MI to TROY, MI
2011-07-21Changed primary regulatory agency from OFFICE OF THRIFT SUPERVISION to COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY