First National Bank of North Arkansas, History

The following are major historical events for First National Bank of North Arkansas, including mergers and acquisitions.

1889-02-18Institution established: Original name:The First National Bank of Berryville
1990-03-26Changed name to The First National Bank of Berryville and Eureka Springs
1991-12-10Changed name to The First National Bank of Berryville
1994-04-30Reorganized.
2011-09-01Changed name to First National Bank of North Arkansas