First National Bank and Trust Company of Weatherford
Headquarters: | First National Bank and Trust Company of Weatherford 220 Palo Pinto St Weatherford, TX 76086 |
Established: | 05/15/1880 |
FDIC Insurance: | 01/01/1934 |
FDIC Cert: | #5575 |
Charter Class: | Commercial bank, national (federal) charter and Fed member, supervised by the Office of the Comptroller of the Currency (OCC) |
# of Branches: | 13 |
Total Assets: | $989,499,000 |
Total Deposits: | $895,782,000 |
History
1880-05-15 | Institution established: Original name:The First National Bank of Weatherford | |
1987-12-10 | Changed name to First National Bank and Trust Company of Weatherford | |
2021-02-19 | Acquired First National Bank BairdFirst National Bank and Trust Company of Weatherford (3086) in BAIRD, TX. |