First Midwest Bank, History

The following are a list of major historical events for First Midwest Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.

1933-02-13Institution established: Original name:Moline National Bank
1985-07-01Changed name to First Midwest Bank/Moline, a National Association
1988-04-01Changed name to First Midwest Bank/Western Illinois, National Association
1988-04-01Acquired First Midwest Bank/Knox County, National Association (3687) in GALESBURG, IL
1995-05-18Changed name to First Midwest Bank, National Association
1995-05-18Acquired First Midwest Bank, National Association (21916) in WAUKEGAN, IL
1995-05-18Acquired First Midwest Bank/Illinois, National Association (1792) in PLAINFIELD, IL
1995-05-18Acquired First Midwest Bank/Danville, National Association (3645) in DANVILLE, IL
1996-11-30Acquired First Midwest Bank/Quad Cities, National Association (28832) in MOLINE, IL
1998-02-23Acquired McHenry State Bank (5752) in MCHENRY, IL
1998-02-23Moved bank headquarters from MOLINE, IL to MCHENRY, IL
1998-10-26Acquired Heritage Bank (9272) in BLUE ISLAND, IL
1999-04-12Moved bank headquarters from MCHENRY, IL to BUFFALO GROVE, IL
1999-12-31Acquired Heritage Bank, National Association (3697) in MONEE, IL
2001-06-29Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL OR SAVINGS BANKS, STATE, MEMBERS FRS
2001-06-29Changed name to First Midwest Bank
2001-06-29Changed primary regulatory agency from COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY to FEDERAL RESERVE BOARD
2001-06-29Acquired First Midwest Trust Company, National Association (16340) in SENECA, IL
2002-05-07Moved bank headquarters from BUFFALO GROVE, IL to ITASCA, IL
2004-02-14Acquired Covest Banc, National Association (29008) in DES PLAINES, IL
2006-05-13Acquired Bank Calumet National Association (9644) in HAMMOND, IN
2009-10-23Acquired First Dupage Bank (35038) in WESTMONT, IL as part of a government assisted transaction.
2010-04-23Acquired Peotone Bank and Trust Company (10888) in PEOTONE, IL as part of a government assisted transaction.
2010-08-13Acquired Palos Bank and Trust Company (17599) in PALOS HEIGHTS, IL as part of a government assisted transaction.
2012-08-03Acquired Waukegan Savings Bank (28243) in WAUKEGAN, IL as part of a government assisted transaction.
2014-12-06Acquired Great Lakes Bank, National Association (3610) in BLUE ISLAND, IL
2015-12-05Acquired The Peoples' Bank of Arlington Heights (35195) in ARLINGTON HEIGHTS, IL
2016-03-12Acquired The National Bank & Trust Company of Sycamore (10036) in SYCAMORE, IL
2017-02-04Acquired Standard Bank and Trust Company (16606) in HICKORY HILLS, IL
2018-05-07Moved bank headquarters from ITASCA, IL to CHICAGO, IL
2018-12-07Acquired Norstates Bank (18626) in WAUKEGAN, IL
2019-05-11Acquired Bridgeview Bank Group (21122) in BRIDGEVIEW, IL
2020-06-13Acquired Park Bank (26218) in MILWAUKEE, WI