First Liberty Bank, History

The following are major historical events for First Liberty Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.

1933-12-12Institution established: Original name:Meno Guaranty Bank
2005-12-31Changed name to The Farmers State Bank
2006-01-01Acquired The Farmer's State Bank (17984) in HAZELTON, KS
2006-09-19Changed name to First Liberty Bank
2006-09-29Moved bank headquarters from MENO, OK to OKLAHOMA CITY, OK