Farmers & Stockmens Bank
Status: | Inactive as of 11/22/2022 |
Merger - Without Assistance | |
Successor Bank: | CrossFirst Bank |
Headquarters: | Farmers & Stockmens Bank 22 Maple St Clayton, NM 88415 |
Established: | 07/06/1920 |
FDIC Insurance: | 01/12/1934 |
FDIC Cert: | #13625 |
Charter Class: | Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember, supervised by the FDIC |
Total Assets: | $572,307,000 |
Total Deposits: | $507,880,000 |
History
1920-07-06 | Institution established: Original name:The Farmers and Stockmens Bank of Clayton | |
2009-07-16 | Changed name to Farmers & Stockmens Bank | |
2009-11-11 | Acquired The Citizens National Bank of Akron (2992) in AKRON, CO | |
2022-11-22 | Merged into and subsequently operated as part of CrossFirst Bank (58648) |