Home > Evans Bank > History
Evans Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Evans Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1920-01-01 | Institution established: Original name:The Evans National Bank of Angola | |
1989-01-31 | Reorganized. | |
1995-02-01 | Changed name to Evans National Bank | |
2008-08-01 | Changed name to Evans Bank, National Association | |
2009-07-24 | Acquired Waterford Village Bank (58065) in WILLIAMSVILLE, NY as part of a government assisted transaction. | |
2020-05-01 | Acquired Fairport Savings Bank (30056) in FAIRPORT, NY |